Marczuk, Dorota (CPSO#: 85714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Bialystok University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 488-1951
Fax: (866) 488-1457
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dorota Marczuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marczuk ( CPSO# 85714 )

Business Address:
460 Springbank Drive
Suite 203
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 488-1951

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOROTA MARCZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCZUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008