Margaliot, Adit (CPSO#: 72261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
845 Wilson Avenue Suite 301
Toronto ON  M3K 1E6
Phone: (416) 635-0909
Fax: (416) 635-0300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atlas Margaliot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Atlas ( CPSO# 73562 )
Dr. A. Margaliot ( CPSO# 72261 )

Business Address:
560 - 135 Queens Plate Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 749-0869

Business Address:
301 - 845 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1E6
Phone Number: (416) 635-0909

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADIT MARGALIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGALIOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004