Margel, Daniel Aaron (CPSO#: 88439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Lakeside Terrace, Suite 201
Barrie Ontario
L4M 0H9
Barrie ON  L4M0H9
Phone: 705 503 4146
Fax: 705 252 3937
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Margel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Margel ( CPSO# 88439 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 503-4146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL AARON MARGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013