Margolis, Myles (CPSO#: 60008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Radiology
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5277
Fax: (416) 586-8695
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: M. Margolis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Margolis ( CPSO# 60008 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Radiology
566 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYLES MARGOLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGOLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992