Margulies, Niculina Mariana (CPSO#: 75246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Digestive Health Clinic
Suite 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 926-0262
Fax: (416) 926-0936
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Don Valley Endoscopy Center
2175 Sheppard Ave. East, Suite 308
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 638-5889
Fax: (416) 638-5043
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

PROMED Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
Fax: (416) 634-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Margulies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Margulies ( CPSO# 75246 )

Business Address:
Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
Suite 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
Ontario Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
Suite 308
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 638-5889

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICULINA MARIANA MARGULIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGULIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004