Mariados, Neil-Alan Francois (CPSO#: 70896)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 04 Nov 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 1998