Maric, Peter (CPSO#: 91647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Maric Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Maric ( CPSO# 91647 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MARIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jun 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2009 to 11 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 22 May 2012 to 21 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010