Marien, Leslie Robert (CPSO#: 32027)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: P.O Box 40052 Springbrook P.O Orangeville ON L9W 0A7
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Apr 1992
Summary:

In April 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Marien guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of 
Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.   
Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Marien was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. 
 
   2. Dr. Marien s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of two months, with the suspension itself to be 
      suspended provided that the following conditions were fulfilled: 
 
      (i)      Dr. Marien was to consult with the Director of the Education Department of the College of 
               Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario regarding the appropriate assessment of his knowledge, skill 
               and judgment in respect of the practice of medicine. 
 
      (ii)     As part of this assessment, Dr. Marien was to be referred by the Director of the Education 
               Department of the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program. 
 
      (iii)    Dr. Marien was to consent to the release by the College to the McMaster Physician Review 
               Program of any information considered appropriate by the Director of Education of the College 
               prior to the assessment taking place. 
 
      (iv)     Dr. Marien was to attend the McMaster Physician Review Program and was to cooperate in every 
               respect with the assessment provided by the Program. 
 
      (v)      Dr. Marien was to consent to the release by the McMaster Physician Review Program to the 
               College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario of any information with respect to the assessment 
               and the result of the assessment as might be considered necessary by the Director of the Education 
               Department of the College. 
 
      (vi)     Dr. Marien was to complete any period of supervision and any program of upgrading which might 
               be recommended by the Physician Review Program successfully and to the satisfaction of the 
               Registrar, and was to submit himself to such further reassessment or reassessments as might from 
               time to time be recommended by the Physician Review Program, and would complete any 
               training, upgrading or period of supervision recommended by the Physician Review Program from 
               time to time on the occasion of any re-assessment or re-assessments which might be 
               recommended. 
 
      (vii)    Dr. Marien was to pay to the College the cost of his assessment at the McMaster Physician Review 
               Program as and when invoiced in an amount to be prescribed by the Registrar of the College, said 
               amount not to exceed $8000.00. 
 
      (viii) In the event of the Doctor's failing, in the judgment of the Registrar, to comply with any of these terms and 
               conditions, the full suspension of licence hereinbefore mentioned would come into effect. 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 21 Apr 1992