Marin, Alina (CPSO#: 86616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: (613) 544-9666
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alina Marin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marin ( CPSO# 86616 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alina Marin may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  Queen's  University,  in  which  Dr.  Marin  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires when Dr. Marin no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.