Marinova, Evguenia Latinova (CPSO#: 89068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical University Sofia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Fax: (905) 579-1583
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marinova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Marinova ( CPSO# 89068 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVGUENIA LATINOVA MARINOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARINOVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Oct 2008
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Oct 2008 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2009 to 23 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010