Marion, Marc Hill (CPSO#: 58812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J3
Phone: (613) 257-2311
Fax: (613) 253-0044
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fernandez Marion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fernandez ( CPSO# 58810 )
Dr. M. Marion ( CPSO# 58812 )

Business Address:
299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J3
Phone Number: (613) 257-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC HILL MARION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARION is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 1986 to 07 Aug 1986
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2007 to 24 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987