Marioni, Peter (CPSO#: 14483)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 12 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Oct 1988