Mark, Corey Justin James (CPSO#: 74890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3000
1310B Paluxy Road
Granbury TX  76048
United States
Phone: (817) 579-3906
Fax: 817 579 3905

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COREY JUSTIN JAMES MARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: June 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On June 16, 2017, the Texas Medical Board made an order, on agreement with Dr. Mark, that Dr. Mark complete at least four hours of continuing medical education on risk management. This was based on a finding that Dr. Mark failed to maintain an adequate medical record for a patient. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on July 26, 2017.