Mark, Pamela Alison (CPSO#: 54094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2772 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4C 1L7
Phone: (416) 699-8105
Fax: (416) 699-3273
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Mark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mark ( CPSO# 54094 )

Business Address:
2772 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4C 1L7
Phone Number: (416) 699-8105

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA ALISON MARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1985