Mark, Trisha Michelle (CPSO#: 72413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department Anesthesiology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

THe York Plastic Surgery
490 Harry Walker Parkway S. Unit4+5
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0B3
Canada
Phone: (905) 898-2519
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Ford Moore Dentistry Prof Corp
Suite 201
234 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-3727
Fax: (905) 853-7537
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Trisha Mark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mark ( CPSO# 72413 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesiology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
201 - 234 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3727

Business Address:
Suites 4 and 5
490 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 898-2519

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISHA MICHELLE MARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003