Markham, John William (CPSO#: 69755)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1999