Markland, Brenda Allison (CPSO#: 55896)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2010