Markman, Saul Jacob (CPSO#: 53363)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 17 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Sep 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1998
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Sep 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Oct 2000
Summary:

 On October 12, 2000, the Discipline Committee heard Dr. Markman's guilty plea and found him guilty 
 of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession and in that he contravened the regulations under the Medicine Act, 1991 by failing to 
 maintain the records required. The hearing continued and on April 30, 2001, the Committee found 
 Dr. Markman guilty of incompetence.

On June 19, 2001, the Discipline Committee revoked Dr. 
 Markman's certificate of registration effective immediately.

Dr. Markman appealed to the 
 Divisional Court on July 19, 2001. On October 3, 2003, the Divisional Court set aside the penalty 
 of revocation and substituted a suspension of one year.  The Divisional Court also reduced the 
 cost award against Dr. Markman from $63,235 to $10,000.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 03 Oct 2003
Hearing Date(s): Oct 11, 2000


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 May 1999
Summary:

 In May 1999, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Markman guilty of professional misconduct with 
 regard to engaging in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional as defined under paragraph 27.32 of Ontario Regulation 448, R.R.O. 1980, made under 
 the Health Disciplines Act, 1980; as well as engaging in conduct unbecoming a physician as defined 
 in clause 1(1)34 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, S.O. 1993.  In 
 August 1999 the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Markman(s certificate of registration be 
 revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 01 Oct 2001
Hearing Date(s): Aug 10, 1998