Marko, Emily Kathleen (CPSO#: 59543)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 08 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: Marko-Peterkin, Emily Kathleen (used until: 12 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1996