Marko, Jana (CPSO#: 26123)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Markova, Jana (used until: 26 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:P.J. Safarika University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2014