Markowitz, Samuel Nahman (CPSO#: 51927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Romanian

Education:The Hebrew University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1225 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M6H 2H1
Phone: (416) 531-5425
Fax: (416) 531-6728
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Eye Clinic
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5892
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

suite 117
1929 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-9995
Fax: (416) 531-6728
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL NAHMAN MARKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985