Marks, Catherine (CPSO#: 76827)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Marks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007


Corporation Name: Faltas and Marks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 25 2014


Corporation Name: C. Marks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 12 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Ste Marie Medical Clinic Unit 7 2010 Trim Road Orleans, ON K4A 0G4
Date Received: 22 Apr 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014