Marks, Paul Howard (CPSO#: 56832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M G 350
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6838
Fax: (416) 480-6840
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2075 bayview avenue
MG 350
Toronto ON  M4N3M5
Canada
Phone: 4164806838
Fax: 4164806840
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Marks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Marks ( CPSO# 56832 )
Dr. S. Granovsky ( CPSO# 65289 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
MG 350
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6838

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL HOWARD MARKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1991 to 30 Sep 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987