Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Marks, Saul Ian (CPSO#: 62203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410-200 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M4V 1R1
Phone: (416) 962-6704
Fax: (855) 221-5931
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Document Scanning (RSRS) 1-888-563-3732 ext 1
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAUL IAN MARKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1992