Markson, Lisa Ann (CPSO#: 65709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York-Stony Brook, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
10083 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 3Y8
Phone: (905) 832-6546
Fax: (905) 832-6548
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANN MARKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 May 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1997