Marliss, Errol Basil (CPSO#: 25011)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 1992