Marlow, Aaron Lee (CPSO#: 67905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
VOSS
Suite #1
3300 High Street
Portsmouth VA  23707
United States
Phone: (757) 399-5949

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON LEE MARLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARLOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1999