Marmor, Eric (CPSO#: 62298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 270-1104
Fax: (905) 270-0569
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Marmor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Marmor ( CPSO# 62298 )
Dr. J. Gortler ( CPSO# 72229 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 270-1104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 10 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC MARMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARMOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1992