Marmur, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 56388)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1994