Maroti, Valeria (CPSO#: 51037)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Sciences,Budapest, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000