Marotta, Paul Joseph (CPSO#: 63854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3406
Fax: (519) 663-3858
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Marotta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Marotta ( CPSO# 63854 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3406

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH MAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAROTTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992