Marovac, Milomir Misha (CPSO#: 86263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bank Respiratory Services
Unit 515
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 523-4444
Fax: (613) 523-6444
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milomir Misha Marovac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marovac ( CPSO# 86263 )

Business Address:
515 - 1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 523-4444

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILOMIR MISHA MAROVAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAROVAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011