Marquis, Jean-Francois (CPSO#: 30444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa Heart
Institute
Ottawa Civic Hospital
H3410 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4919
Fax: (613) 761-5215
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Francois Marquis Medicine Societe Professionelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marquis ( CPSO# 30444 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Suite H3410A
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4919

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-FRANCOIS MARQUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARQUIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1978