Marr, Hubert Kin-Ming (CPSO#: 69395)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2001