Marr, Sharon Amy (CPSO#: 65177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Peter's Health System
Geriatric Medicine
88 Maplewood Avenue
Juravinski Research Centre, office
Hamilton ON  L8S 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837 Ext. 12442
Fax: (905) 525-2327
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON AMY MARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993