Marras, Laurie Constance (CPSO#: 68857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
7 McLaughlin
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6422
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marras ( CPSO# 68857 )
Dr. T. Marras ( CPSO# 68858 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
7 MCI - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5848

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 7E-452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5848

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE CONSTANCE MARRAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000