Marras, Theodore (CPSO#: 68858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
7E 452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5767
Fax: (416) 603-5375
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marras ( CPSO# 68857 )
Dr. T. Marras ( CPSO# 68858 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
7 MCI - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5848

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 7E-452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5848

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 27 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE MARRAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999