Marrat, Saida (CPSO#: 74037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (416) 913-0964
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Marrat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marrat ( CPSO# 74037 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 913-0964

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Aug 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAIDA MARRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 10 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002