Marriage, Samantha Jane Mills (CPSO#: 95734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samantha Marriage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marriage ( CPSO# 95734 )

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B5
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JANE MILLS MARRIAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIAGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2014