Marrin, Michael Lefebvre (CPSO#: 42710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 4F1F
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76648
Fax: (905) 521-5007
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M & A Marrin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marrin ( CPSO# 76994 )
Dr. M. Marrin ( CPSO# 42710 )

Business Address:
200 - 2495 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-7533

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Room 4F1F
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEFEBVRE MARRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1986