Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Marriott, Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 30430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
M Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7580 Ext. x 3318
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke, ON
Mississauga ON  M9C 1A4
Canada
Phone: 416-259-6671 Ext. 4047
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2200 Eglinton Ave. W
Mississauga, ON
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017


Corporation Name: Marriott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marriott ( CPSO# 30430 )

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Business Address:
22 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2W1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH MARRIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 24 Feb 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982