Marriott, Jason James Austin (CPSO#: 88420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Migration Health Branch
Immigration, Refugees and
Citizenship Canada
300 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1A 1L1
Phone: (613) 437-5635
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Canada
Phone: (613) 789-3270
Fax: (613) 789-8710
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON JAMES AUSTIN MARRIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010