Marriott, John Anthony Sefton (CPSO#: 23082)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 27 Jan 2017


Address: Joseph Brant Hospital (905) 632-3730 ext. 4117, North Halton Mental Health (905) 825-6000, Bruce Shoreline Mental Health (519) 797-2880, Saugeen Memorial Hospital (519) 376-2121
Date Received: 05 Dec 2016


Address: 392 6th Concession Road East, Millgrove, ON, L8B 1M5, (905) 690-1804
Date Received: 05 Dec 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 2016