Marriott, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 64336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin ON  N0H 2C3
Phone: (519) 832-9600
Fax: (519) 832-9602
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Marriott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marriott ( CPSO# 64336 )

Business Address:
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin ON  N0H 2C3
Phone Number: (519) 832-9600

Business Address:
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-5112

Business Address:
140 Grey Street South
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-5112

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5N3
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW MARRIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Jul 1991 to 02 Sep 1991
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1992