Marsan, Joseph Guerrino (CPSO#: 23954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Montreal, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Medical Support
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 795-1081
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH GUERRINO MARSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978