Marseu, Katherine Lindsay (CPSO#: 86348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street, Eaton North
3rd Floor Room 437
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5164
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine L. Marseu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Marseu ( CPSO# 86348 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street, Eaton North
3rd Floor, Room 437
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE LINDSAY MARSEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSEU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013