Marsh, Alexander Stalker (CPSO#: 32973)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Marsh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marsh ( CPSO# 32973 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Akyurekli, McKenna and Rassouli Suite 216-945 Third Avenue East Owen Sound ON N4K 2Kb
Date Received: 02 May 2017


Address: Patients seeking a copy/transfer of their medical record may send their request to: Suite 216 945 Third Avenue East Owen Sound, ON N4K 2K8
Date Received: 20 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017