Marshall, Alexis Grace (CPSO#: 98156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  23 Aug 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Holland Orthopaedic &
Arthritic Centre
43 Wellesley St E
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Alexis  Grace  Marshall may practise orthopaedic surgery while under
                  supervision coordinated  by a supervisor acceptable to the College at the
                  following locations: 

                  (i)   St. Michael's Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre in Toronto, Ontario;
                  
                  (iii) Women's College Hospital in Toronto, Ontario; and
                  
                  (iv)  Holland Orthopaedic and Arthritic Centre in Toronto, Ontario.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Marshall's eligibility to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Marshall's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports  to  the  College  by  the  due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Marshall's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on August 24, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before August 23, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.