Marshall, Bruce Roger (CPSO#: 30993)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Feb 2009

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: January 22, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Bruce Roger Marshall undertakes to resign effective February 15, 2009, and not to re-apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.