Marshall, David Henry (CPSO#: 65270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 202
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 226-8777
Fax: (613) 226-5974
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Riverdside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital General Campus
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Perth and Smiths Falls
District Hospital
60 Cornelius Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: (613) 283-2330
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David H. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marshall ( CPSO# 65270 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 226-8777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HENRY MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993